Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard Schwenzer, SS.CC.

Bishop Emeritus of Oslo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1938 BornLorch
18 Jul 196425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
29 Aug 197536.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
29 Aug 197536.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hólar
7 Dec 197537.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hólar
29 Mar 197940.5AppointedPrelate of Trondheim, Norway
2 Jun 198142.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oslo, Norway
26 Nov 198345.2SucceededBishop of Oslo, Norway
29 Jul 200566.8ResignedBishop of Oslo, Norway

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Schwenzer:
Bishop Gerhard Schwenzer SS.CC. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Oslo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oslo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013