Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nommesch

Deceased

Bishop of Luxembourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1864BornGreiveldange [Greiweldingen]
28 Oct 189025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Luxembourg
8 Mar 192055.2AppointedBishop of Luxembourg
25 Mar 192055.3Ordained BishopBishop of Luxembourg
9 Oct 193570.8DiedBishop of Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nommesch:
Bishop Pierre Nommesch (born , died ) Bishop of Luxembourg

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013