Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Alphonse de Wachter

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1855BornPuers
20 Sep 187924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
21 Jun 190954.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
21 Jun 190954.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
25 Jul 190954.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
15 Nov 193277.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Antoine Alphonse de Wachter:
Bishop Antoine Alphonse de Wachter (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013