Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Noël de Cleene, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Léopoldville

Titular Bishop of Usula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1870BornNieuwkerken-Waas, Belgium
18 Dec 189222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
18 Dec 192454.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Dec 192454.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
24 Feb 192555.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
Feb 1926³56.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Jul 193262.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Oct 194272.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Noël de Cleene:
Bishop Noël de Cleene C.I.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Léopoldville

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013