Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Désiré Felicien François Joseph Cardinal Mercier

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1851Born
4 Apr 187422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
21 Feb 190654.2AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
25 Mar 190654.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
15 Apr 190755.4Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190755.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
23 Jan 192674.1DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Désiré Felicien François Joseph Mercier
Désiré Felicien François Joseph Cardinal Mercier (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBraine-l'Alleud

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
  • a cardinal for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c12: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1907
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 246
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 693, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast