Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste De Clercq, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Thignica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1870Born
16 Jul 189323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
24 Aug 191848.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Aug 191848.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thignica
12 Jan 191948.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thignica
29 Oct 193868.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Nov 193969.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kasaï Superiore, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Auguste De Clercq
Bishop Auguste De Clercq C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvecapelle-lez-Furnes, Belgium

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,919, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast