Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gastone Antonio Rasneur

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1874BornMainvault
1899¹24.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 192449.9AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
25 Mar 192450.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
23 Nov 193965.7DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gastone Antonio Rasneur:
Bishop Gastone Antonio Rasneur (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013