Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kinshasa

Archidioecesis Kinshasana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Laurent Monsengwo Pasinya, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Fridolin Ambongo Besungu, O.F.M. Cap., Coadjutor Archbishop
  • Edouard Kisonga Ndinga, S.S.S., Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 30 May 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 8,500 (3,283 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archikin.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 2 Avenue de l'Universite, Quartier Mososo, Cummune Limete, Kinshasa 1, Rep, Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (082)29.92.036

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Belgian Congo {Congo Belga} o Indipendente
22 November 1886ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Lower Congo {Congo Inferiore}
Vicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Belgian Congo {Congo Belga} o Indipendente (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville
11 May 1888ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Belgian Congo {Congo Belga} o Indipendente Vicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville
26 February 1934Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville Vicariate Apostolic of Boma (erected)
14 June 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville Prefecture Apostolic of Kole (erected)
29 June 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville Vicariate Apostolic of Inongo (erected)
Archdiocese of Léopoldville
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville Archdiocese of Léopoldville
Archdiocese of Kinshasa
30 May 1966Name ChangedArchdiocese of Léopoldville Archdiocese of Kinshasa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville
1950116,631481,65324.2%41101141,023169166ap1951
Archdiocese of Léopoldville
Archdiocese of Kinshasa
1970560,3001,250,00044.8%2252252,49032233730ap1971
19801,096,0002,030,00054.0%441902344,68332533173ap1981
19881,700,0003,400,00050.0%1132123255,23049838294ap1991
19983,700,0006,000,00061.7%3303777075,2339141,271123ap2001
20013,900,0006,500,00060.0%3542375916,5986671,123125ap2002
20023,900,0006,500,00060.0%3632766396,1037641,141125ap2003
20033,900,0006,500,00060.0%4053887934,9189211,206125ap2004
20043,500,0007,000,00050.0%3116809913,5311,1391,679125ap2005
20063,601,0007,203,00050.0%3367021,0383,4691,2491,813125ap2007
20135,830,00010,516,00055.4%1969701,1665,0001,6611,982143ap2014
20166,378,00011,323,00056.3%2389701,2085,2791,6611,982143ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.1, 30 Dec 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2018