Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro

Archidioecesis Mbandakana-Bikoroensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ernest Ngboko Ngombe, C.I.C.M., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 12 April 1975
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 114,790 (44,337 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archevêché, 39 Avenue Bolenge, Mbandaka, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (082)945.14.51; (085)810.96.96

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Tsuapa
11 February 1924ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nouvelle-Anvers Prefecture Apostolic of Tsuapa (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Coquilhatville
28 January 1926Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Tsuapa Prefecture Apostolic of Coquilhatville
3 January 1931Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Coquilhatville (Bikoro)
Vicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville (Remaining part of Bikoro)
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bikoro (erected)
1 March 1931Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Coquilhatville (Ngoonbe) Prefecture Apostolic of Basankusu
1 March 1931Territory AddedPrefecture Apostolic of Basankusu (Gkota-Bosaka) Prefecture Apostolic of Coquilhatville
Vicariate Apostolic of Coquilhatville
22 March 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Coquilhatville Vicariate Apostolic of Coquilhatville
24 May 1950Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Coquilhatville (Boundries adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango (Boundries adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kisantu (Boundries adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Léopoldville (Boundries adjusted)
14 June 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Basankusu
Vicariate Apostolic of Coquilhatville
Vicariate Apostolic of Lisala
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
Prefecture Apostolic of Isangi (erected)
Archdiocese of Coquilhatville
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Coquilhatville Archdiocese of Coquilhatville
11 September 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Coquilhatville Diocese of Ikela (erected)
Archdiocese of Mbandaka
30 May 1966Name ChangedArchdiocese of Coquilhatville Archdiocese of Mbandaka
Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro
12 April 1975Name ChangedDiocese of Bikoro (suppressed) (Bikoro, Irebu, Bokongo, Lukolela, Itipo, and Iboko)
Archdiocese of Mbandaka
Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Coquilhatville
194980,278423,94518.9%152531,5147397ap1951
Archdiocese of Coquilhatville
Archdiocese of Mbandaka
1969128,721436403,2186110219ap1971
Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro
1980177,624505,00035.2%1055652,7326613536ap1981
1990254,722689,00037.0%2546713,5876812837ap1991
1996296,438839,32735.3%4834823,6155011638ap2001
2001350,096864,00040.5%3924635,5574612732ap2002
2002360,000885,00040.7%4026665,4544211732ap2003
2003364,000898,00040.5%3822606,0663611033ap2004
2004364,000898,00040.5%3923625,8703712033ap2005
2013598,0001,141,00052.4%5435896,7199415034ap2014
2016646,0001,232,00052.4%5631877,425428234ap2017
2019710,0001,354,00052.4%6136977,3197412535ap2020
20211,620,7212,448,40666.2%604610615,2898612435ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Coquilhatville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 23, Page 374, and Page 375
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Coquilhatville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 300
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 42, Page 648, and Page 649
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 43, Page 284, and Page 285
  • Archdiocese of Coquilhatville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 52, Page 372, to Page 377
  • Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 67, Page 346
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
    Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 15 Nov 2023