Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hilaire Marie Vermeiren, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Coquilhatville

Titular Archbishop of Pedachtoë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1889BornBeveren-Waes, Belgium
15 Aug 191223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Apr 194757.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Apr 194757.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gibba
25 Jul 194758.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gibba
10 Nov 195970.5AppointedArchbishop of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Apr 196373.9RetiredArchbishop of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Apr 196373.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pedachtoë
18 Aug 196778.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Hilaire Marie Vermeiren:
Archbishop Hilaire Marie Vermeiren M.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Coquilhatville

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015