Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Weigl, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bokungu-Ikela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1913BornNeunburg, Germany
11 Jul 193724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
11 Sep 196148.3AppointedBishop of Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Nov 196148.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Mar 198268.8ResignedBishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 Feb 198571.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Weigl:
Bishop Joseph Weigl M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bokungu-Ikela

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015