Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Grent, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amboina, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1889Born
7 Oct 191425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
13 Mar 194353.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nuova Guinea Olandese, Indonesia
10 Jul 194757.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese, Indonesia
10 Jul 194757.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Parlais
31 Aug 194758.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parlais
12 May 194959.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Amboina, Indonesia
3 Jan 196171.3AppointedBishop of Amboina, Indonesia
15 Jan 196575.3RetiredBishop of Amboina, Indonesia
15 Jan 196575.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Betagbarar
15 Nov 197687.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Betagbarar
11 Aug 198393.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Amboina, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Jacques Grent
Bishop Jacques Grent M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amboina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWervershoof, Netherlands

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017