Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Amboina

Dioecesis AmboinaŽnsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Makassar
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 83,777 (32,358 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Jl. Pattimura 26, Ambon 97124 [Maluku], Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0911) 344.231
  • Fax: 352.556

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese
22 December 1902ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese
29 August 1920ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese Vicariate Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese
12 May 1949Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese Prefecture Apostolic of Hollandia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Amboina
12 May 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese Vicariate Apostolic of Amboina
24 June 1950Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Amboina Vicariate Apostolic of Merauke (erected)
Diocese of Amboina
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Amboina Diocese of Amboina

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Amboina
195029,160980,0003.0%2323485723733ap1951
Diocese of Amboina
197061,7001,136,5135.4%128292,12754142ap1971
198082,7601,252,0006.6%131322,586751674ap1981
199090,1041,568,0005.7%232342,6501601754ap1991
1999113,4632,968,5163.8%1730472,4144420937ap2000
2000128,3792,181,4145.9%1730472,7314421632ap2001
2001128,6272,180,8195.9%2333562,2963712336ap2002
2002137,2762,088,7086.6%2726532,5904316031ap2003
2003142,1452,112,6366.7%3830682,0904516632ap2004
2004138,5922,089,8256.6%3725622,2354219631ap2005
2006148,2122,142,0006.9%4132732,0304414234ap2007
2012127,6092,311,0005.5%4745921,3875921243ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013