Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnoldus Johannes Hubertus Aerts, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese

Titular Bishop of Apollonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1880BornSwolgen, Netherlands
8 Sep 190020.6ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
6 Aug 190525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
20 Jul 192040.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
28 Aug 192040.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese, Indonesia
30 Nov 192040.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
30 Jul 194262.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Arnoldus Johannes Hubertus Aerts:
Bishop Arnoldus Johannes Hubertus Aerts M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 60
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013