Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Pieter Franz van Velsen, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia

Titular Bishop of Aezani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1865BornOverveen, Netherlands
1895¹29.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Jan 192459.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
21 Jan 192459.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aezani
13 May 192459.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aezani
Mar 1933³68.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
6 May 193671.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia, Indonesia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Pieter Franz van Velsen:
Bishop Anton Pieter Franz van Velsen S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013