Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Leonardus Trudon Brans, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Medan, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Corna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1879Born
19 Dec 190829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Jul 192141.6AppointedPrefect of Sumatra, Indonesia
12 Jul 193252.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Corna
12 Jul 193252.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Padang, Indonesia
5 Feb 193353.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corna
23 Dec 194162.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Medan, Indonesia
12 May 195474.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Medan, Indonesia
12 Dec 196990.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Medan, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Mathias Leonardus Trudon Brans
Bishop Mathias Leonardus Trudon Brans O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Medan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrijp, Netherlands

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018