Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Medan

Archidioecesis Medanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 102,738 (39,682 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://archdioceseofmedan.or.id/
  • Mailing Address: Jl. Imam Bonjol 39, Kotak Pos 1191, Medan 20152, Sumatera Utara, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (061)451-6647; 451-9768
  • Fax: 414-5745

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sumatra
30 June 1911ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Sumatra (erected)
27 December 1923Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Sumatra Prefecture Apostolic of Benkoelen (erected)
27 December 1923Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Sumatra Prefecture Apostolic of Banka e Biliton (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Padang
27 December 1923Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Sumatra Prefecture Apostolic of Padang
Vicariate Apostolic of Padang
18 July 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Padang Vicariate Apostolic of Padang
Vicariate Apostolic of Medan
23 December 1941Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Padang Vicariate Apostolic of Medan
17 November 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Medan Prefecture Apostolic of Sibolga (erected)
Archdiocese of Medan
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Medan Archdiocese of Medan

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Medan
195035,5246,000,000.6%1474874021101243ap1951
Archdiocese of Medan
1969173,3166,710,0002.6%178792,19316027531ap1971
1980269,1467,600,0003.5%1021022,638195361ap1981
1990367,69410,010,2643.7%81021103,342122137742ap1991
1999458,35215,225,0003.0%171011183,88434260043ap2000
2000469,49815,525,0003.0%181131313,58331761343ap2001
2001483,22912,025,9244.0%181171353,57924562243ap2002
2002491,27214,598,5443.4%201211413,48427581243ap2003
2003496,83614,486,3643.4%231271503,31229371043ap2004
2004501,07914,389,8983.5%221251473,40837273244ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014