Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pangkal-Pinang

Dioecesis Pangkalpinangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Hilarius Moa Nurak, S.V.D., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Palembang
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 30,442 (11,758 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.keuskupanpkpinang.org/
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Stasiun XXI 545A, Kelurahan Semabung Lama, Pangkalpinang 33147, Bangka, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0717)42.40.14
  • Fax: 43.23.98

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Banka e Biliton
27 December 1923ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Sumatra Prefecture Apostolic of Banka e Biliton (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Pangkal-Pinang
8 February 1951ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Banka e Biliton Vicariate Apostolic of Pangkal-Pinang
Diocese of Pangkal-Pinang
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Pangkal-Pinang Diocese of Pangkal-Pinang
1 July 2003Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Pangkal-Pinang (from Medan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Banka e Biliton
19502,150466,720.5%117181191625ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Pangkal-Pinang
Diocese of Pangkal-Pinang
197011,055785,0001.4%1171861436351ap1971
198014,143964,8031.5%2141688322221ap1981
199020,2651,148,8881.8%315181,12530271ap1991
199928,1061,659,7621.7%197261,081125110ap2000
200028,0341,730,3941.6%21829966135410ap2001
200130,4411,898,0481.6%187251,217125410ap2002
200233,3852,013,5241.7%1911301,112265911ap2003
200334,7261,694,7622.0%221335992195211ap2004
200435,5051,848,9891.9%271037959166612ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Oct 2013