Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Theodosius Jan J. Herkenrath, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Banka e Biliton


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1886BornVelp, Netherlands
18 Jan 192437.8AppointedPrefect of Banka e Biliton, Indonesia
192841.8ResignedPrefect of Banka e Biliton, Indonesia
13 Apr 197286.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Banka e Biliton, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Theodosius Jan J. Herkenrath:
Priest Theodosius Jan J. Herkenrath SS.CC. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Banka e Biliton

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013