Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Wewak

Dioecesis Ueuakensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Józef Roszyński, S.V.D., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 November 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Madang
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Papua New Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 36,917 (14,259 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 107, Wewak, E.S.P. 531, Papua New Guinea
  • Telephone: 456-1675
  • Fax: 456-2573

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land
25 July 1913SplitPrefecture Apostolic of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land
Prefecture Apostolic of Central New Guinea
14 November 1922Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Western Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land Prefecture Apostolic of Central New Guinea
15 April 1931Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea (Aitape and Sepik) Prefecture Apostolic of Central New Guinea
Vicariate Apostolic of Central New Guinea
22 August 1931ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Central New Guinea Vicariate Apostolic of Central New Guinea
15 May 1952Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central New Guinea (Western part of the central territory) Prefecture Apostolic of Aitape (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Wewak
15 May 1952Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central New Guinea Vicariate Apostolic of Wewak
15 May 1959Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Aitape (Remaining parts of Maprik) Vicariate Apostolic of Wewak
15 May 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Wewak (Remaining parts of Lumi) Vicariate Apostolic of Aitape
18 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen
Vicariate Apostolic of Wewak
Vicariate Apostolic of Mount Hagen (erected) (Western Highlands)
Diocese of Wewak
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Wewak Diocese of Wewak

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Central New Guinea
195033,625296,94411.3%464673033ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Wewak
Diocese of Wewak
197084,392195,71943.1%1153641,31819669ap1971
1980113,000208,00054.3%753601,883710157ap1981
1990125,350197,64163.4%853612,05479077ap1991
199989,280145,26461.5%1841591,51367467ap2000
2000182,323278,99865.3%1933523,50667060ap2001
2001187,755280,25867.0%2232543,47666977ap2002
2002193,174288,96866.8%2435593,27467260ap2003
2003193,937292,59766.3%2525503,87856260ap2004
2004195,950295,70066.3%2321444,45344668ap2005
2010210,000344,00061.0%2215375,6751357245ap2011
2014229,000375,00061.1%2511366,361317248ap2015
2017215,700445,50048.4%2110316,958307248ap2018
2020228,000473,88048.1%2110317,354307248ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Central New Guinea
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 222
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Central New Guinea
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 113, and Page 114
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Wewak
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 882
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 435, and Page 436
  • Diocese of Wewak
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 480, to Page 482

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 10 Nov 2023