Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen Joseph Reichert, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Madang, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1943 Born
196319.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Sep 196926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Feb 199551.7AppointedBishop of Mendi, Papua New Guinea
7 May 199551.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mendi, Papua New Guinea
30 Nov 201067.5AppointedArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
2 Feb 201167.7InstalledArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
20 Sep 201370.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
25 Apr 201571.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
26 Jul 201976.1RetiredArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Stephen Joseph Reichert
Archbishop Stephen Joseph Reichert O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeoville, KS, Diocese of Salina, Kansas, USA
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Cathedral, Mendi, Diocese of Mendi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Madang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,548
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 18 Oct 2019

Quantcast