Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Joseph Cardinal Wright

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for the Clergy

Cardinal-Priest of Gesł Divin Maestro alla Pineta Sacchetti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1909BornDorchester, MA
8 Dec 193526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
10 May 194737.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
10 May 194737.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegeae
30 Jun 194737.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegeae
28 Jan 195040.5AppointedBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
7 Mar 195040.6InstalledBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
23 Jan 195949.5AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Mar 195949.7InstalledBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Apr 196959.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
28 Apr 196959.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196959.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Gesł Divin Maestro alla Pineta Sacchetti
1 Jun 196959.9ResignedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
10 Aug 197970.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Wright:
Cardinal John Joseph Wright (born , died ) Prefect of Clergy

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
  • a cardinal for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: CB, 9 Nov 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013