Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremiah Francis Minihan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Paphus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1903BornHaverhill
21 Dec 192926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 May 195450.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 May 195450.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
8 Sep 195451.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
14 Aug 197370.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Jeremiah Francis Minihan:
Bishop Jeremiah Francis Minihan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 23 Nov 2014