Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Joseph Reed

Deceased

Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1905Born
21 Dec 192923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oklahoma, USA
5 Dec 195751.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
5 Dec 195751.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Limisa
21 Jan 195852.0AppointedBishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
5 Mar 195852.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
7 Sep 197165.7DiedBishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Victor Joseph Reed
Bishop Victor Joseph Reed (born , died ) Bishop of Oklahoma City and Tulsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpelier, IN

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018