Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Aloysius Leven

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Angelo, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1905BornBlackwell, OK
10 Jun 192823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oklahoma, USA
3 Dec 195550.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
3 Dec 195550.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bure
8 Feb 195650.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bure
20 Oct 196964.4AppointedBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
24 Apr 197973.9ResignedBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
28 Jun 198378.1DiedBishop Emeritus of San Angelo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Aloysius Leven:
Bishop Stephen Aloysius Leven (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Angelo

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015