Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael David Pfeifer, O.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of San Angelo, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1937 BornAlamo
30 May 195720.0ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
7 Sep 196124.3Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 May 196427.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 Dec 196427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
31 May 198548.0AppointedBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
26 Jul 198548.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
12 Dec 201376.5RetiredBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael David Pfeifer:
Bishop Michael David Pfeifer O.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Angelo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Angelo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2013
  • od/c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015