Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Fitzpatrick

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brownsville, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1918BornTrenton, Canada
13 Dec 194224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
1948¹29.2IncardinatedPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
25 May 195839.6IncardinatedPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
24 Jun 196849.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
24 Jun 196849.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
28 Aug 196849.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae
27 Apr 197152.5AppointedBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
28 May 197152.6InstalledBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
30 Nov 199173.1RetiredBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
15 Jul 200687.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Brownsville, Texas, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Fitzpatrick:
Bishop John Joseph Fitzpatrick (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brownsville

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • opd: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015