Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Nevins

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Venice, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1932BornNew Rochelle, NY
6 Jun 195927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
25 Jan 197947.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
25 Jan 197947.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
24 Mar 197947.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
17 Jul 198452.4AppointedBishop of Venice, Florida, USA
25 Oct 198452.7InstalledBishop of Venice, Florida, USA
19 Jan 200775.0RetiredBishop of Venice, Florida, USA
26 Aug 201482.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Venice, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Nevins:
Bishop John Joseph Nevins (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Venice

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2007
  • d: CB, 27 Aug 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015