Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Anthony McCarthy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Miami, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1918Born
29 May 194325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
21 Apr 196547.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
21 Apr 196547.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamascani
15 Jun 196547.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamascani
25 Aug 196951.3AppointedBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
2 Dec 196951.6InstalledBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
17 Sep 197658.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Miami, Florida, USA
26 Jul 197759.2SucceededArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA
3 Nov 199476.5RetiredArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA
7 Jun 200587.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Miami, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Anthony McCarthy (VIAF: 4141008)
Archbishop Edward Anthony McCarthy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Miami

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati, OH, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Ordained PriestCincinnati, OH, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 May 2018

Quantcast