Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Joseph Alter

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1885BornToledo
4 Jun 191024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
17 Apr 193145.6AppointedBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
17 Jun 193145.8Ordained BishopBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
14 Jun 195064.8AppointedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
19 Jul 196983.9RetiredArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
19 Jul 196983.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Minora
31 Dec 197085.3ResignedTitular Archbishop of Minora
23 Aug 197792.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Karl Joseph Alter:
Archbishop Karl Joseph Alter (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cincinnati

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1931, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jun 2015