Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustus John Schwertner

Deceased

Bishop of Wichita, Kansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1870BornCanton, OH
12 Jun 189726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
15 Apr 191039.3IncardinatedPriest of Toledo, Ohio, USA
10 Mar 192150.2AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
8 Jun 192150.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
22 Jun 192150.4InstalledBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
2 Oct 193968.7DiedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Augustus John Schwertner:
Bishop Augustus John Schwertner (born , died ) Bishop of Wichita

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015