Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Grand Rapids

Dioecesis Grandormensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • David John Walkowiak, Bishop
  • Walter Allison Hurley, Bishop Emeritus
  • Robert John Rose, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 19 May 1882
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Detroit
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Michigan
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 17,592 (6,795 Square Miles)
  • Description: Mason, Lake, Osceola, Oceana, Mecosta, Muskegon, Newaygo, Montcalm, Ottawa, Kent, and Ionia Counties.
  • Conference Region: VI (OH, MI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: GR
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofgrandrapids.org/
  • Mailing Address: 660 Burton St., S.E., Grand Rapids, MI 49507-3290
  • Telephone: (616)243-0491
  • Fax: 243-4910

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
19 May 1882ErectedDiocese of Detroit Diocese of Grand Rapids (erected)
26 February 1938Territory LostArchdiocese of Detroit
Diocese of Grand Rapids
Diocese of Saginaw (erected)
19 December 1970Territory LostDiocese of Grand Rapids
Diocese of Saginaw
Diocese of Gaylord (erected)
19 December 1970Territory LostDiocese of Grand Rapids
Diocese of Lansing
Diocese of Kalamazoo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950111,7591,000,00011.2%1593519457641760162ap1951
1966189,4611,121,34316.9%22352275688401,098130ap1967
1970212,6051,598,04413.3%20560265802671,021130ap1971
1976142,555899,12815.9%12440164869225062388ap1977
1980152,000923,00016.5%14432176863173460992ap1981
1990150,373966,06015.6%119281471,022183141690ap1991
1999153,6011,167,90013.2%123211441,06620129690ap2000
2000154,2191,167,90013.2%121181391,109202029591ap2001
2001158,0501,167,90013.5%124221461,082182429491ap2002
2002161,5251,283,71712.6%122211431,129182328390ap2003
2003162,6701,283,71712.7%126211471,106262227990ap2004
2004162,6701,283,71712.7%121151361,196291627391ap2005
2006166,0001,308,00012.7%121151361,220481724990ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 4 Jul 2013