Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Alexander K. Salatka

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1918BornGrand Rapids
24 Feb 194527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
11 Dec 196143.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
11 Dec 196143.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cariana
6 Mar 196244.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cariana
5 Jan 196849.9AppointedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
25 Mar 196850.1InstalledBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
27 Sep 197759.6AppointedArchbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA
15 Dec 197759.8InstalledArchbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA
24 Nov 199274.7RetiredArchbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA
17 Mar 200385.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Alexander K. Salatka:
Archbishop Charles Alexander K. Salatka (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Oklahoma City

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 18
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013