Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Marquette

Dioecesis Marquettensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Francis Doerfler, Bishop
  • James Henry Garland, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 3 January 1937
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Detroit
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Michigan
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 42,152 (16,281 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: VI (OH, MI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: MAR
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofmarquette.org/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 550, 444 S. Fourth St., Marquette, MI 49855
  • Telephone: (906)225-1141
  • Fax: 225-0437

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Michigan
29 July 1853ErectedDiocese of Detroit Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Michigan (erected)
Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie
9 January 1857ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Upper Michigan Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie (erected) (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette
23 October 1865Name ChangedDiocese of Sault Sainte Marie Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette
Diocese of Marquette
3 January 1937Name ChangedDiocese of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette Diocese of Marquette

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Marquette
195091,034323,54428.1%146251715321331992ap1951
1966106,798307,10534.8%159221815902832996ap1967
1970107,486297,00036.2%137171546972225293ap1971
197696,644304,34731.8%121171387001720187ap1977
198098,528316,00031.2%117171347351715689ap1981
199075,298309,40024.3%112101226177109892ap1991
199972,552319,70022.7%10312115630216474ap2000
200065,497309,00021.2%961110761221116374ap2001
200170,237309,00022.7%941310765622135974ap2002
200270,200317,61622.1%931010368125106174ap2003
200369,500317,61621.9%921110367427115874ap2004
200468,360317,61621.5%881210068328125874ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 13 Jan 2014; data: 16 Jan 2014