Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Eis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA

Titular Bishop of Bita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1843Born
30 Oct 187027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
7 Jun 189956.3AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
24 Aug 189956.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
8 Jul 192279.4RetiredBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
8 Jul 192279.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bita
5 May 192683.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Frederick Eis
Bishop Frederick Eis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbach, Diocese of Trier, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Marquette, Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan
Death PlaceMarquette, Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Crypt, Cathedral, Marquette, Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017