Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Schwebach

Deceased

Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1847Born
16 Jun 187022.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
14 Dec 189144.3AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
25 Feb 189244.5Ordained BishopBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
6 Jun 192173.8DiedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for James Schwebach
Bishop James Schwebach (born , died ) Bishop of La Crosse

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlaten, Vicariate Apostolic of Luxembourg
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, La Crosse, Diocese of La Crosse, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017