Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of La Crosse

Dioecesis Crossensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • William Patrick Callahan, O.F.M. Conv., Bishop

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 March 1868ErectedDiocese of Milwaukee Diocese of La Crosse (erected)
3 May 1905Territory LostDiocese of Green Bay
Diocese of La Crosse
Diocese of Superior (erected)
22 December 1945Territory LostDiocese of Green Bay
Diocese of La Crosse
Archdiocese of Milwaukee
Diocese of Madison (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950142,609577,20624.7%240653054671301,350205ap1951
1966179,509619,44129.0%349534024461741,454201ap1967
1968185,512576,39532.2%303513545241521,224166ap1971
1976199,497667,84929.9%28730317629411,042199ap1977
1980218,754723,00030.3%2612228377244718174ap1981
1990220,266731,30030.1%200212219962130651190ap1991
1999219,358824,20626.6%19732229957246499173ap2000
2000212,419827,44325.7%194262209653533496172ap2001
2001209,426831,04225.2%197282259303434493167ap2002
2002215,573848,45525.4%194252199842825494168ap2003
2003203,341848,45524.0%190222129592525483166ap2004
2004202,540863,61023.5%19011911,060321467165ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Nov 2014