Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Herman Flock Bever

Bishop of San Ignacio de Velasco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1956 BornSparta, WI, USA
9 Jul 198225.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
31 Oct 201255.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
31 Oct 201255.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
17 Jan 201356.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
4 Nov 201660.0AppointedBishop of San Ignacio de Velasco, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Robert Herman Flock Bever
Bishop Robert Herman Flock Bever (born ) Bishop of San Ignacio de Velasco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Ignacio de Velasco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2012
  • ob: CB, 7 Nov 2012
  • c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,646
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Nov 2016