Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tito Solari Capellari, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Cochabamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1939 BornPesariis di Prato Carnico, Italy
23 Dec 196627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Dec 198647.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
16 Dec 198647.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
19 Mar 198747.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
7 Mar 199858.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
8 Jul 199959.8SucceededArchbishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
24 Sep 201475.1RetiredArchbishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Tito Solari Capellari:
Archbishop Tito Solari Capellari S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cochabamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Sep 2014