Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Maria Prata Vuolo, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cochabamba, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1923Born
194622.2Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Jul 195127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Dec 196037.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
9 Dec 196037.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadriania
9 Apr 196137.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadriania
21 Nov 198158.1AppointedArchbishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
19 Sep 198763.9ResignedArchbishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
29 Sep 200582.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Maria Prata Vuolo
Archbishop Gennaro Maria Prata Vuolo S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoccamonfina, Italy

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d/c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast