Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cochabamba

Archidioecesis Cochabambensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Oscar Omar Aparicio Céspedes, Archbishop
  • Robert Herman Flock Bever, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Tito Solari Capellari, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Angel Gelmi Bertocchi, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Luis Sáinz Hinojosa, O.F.M., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 July 1975
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bolivia
  • Square Kilometers: 32,306 (12,478 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiacbba.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Casilla 129, Av. Heroinas 0152, esquina Zenteno Anaya, Cochabamba, Bolivia
  • Telephone: (04)425-6562/3
  • Fax: 425-0522

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cochabamba
25 June 1847ErectedDiocese of Cochabamba (erected)
11 December 1961Territory LostDiocese of Cochabamba Territorial Prelature of Aiquile (erected)
Archdiocese of Cochabamba
30 July 1975ElevatedDiocese of Cochabamba Archdiocese of Cochabamba

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cochabamba
1950500,000680,00073.5%6523885,6813417653ap1951
1965435,300460,86094.5%48951433,04415936749ap1967
1968574,092593,77496.7%69901593,61015838143ap1971
Archdiocese of Cochabamba
1976660,000677,14697.5%55901454,55117029854ap1977
1980656,929699,76293.9%521161683,91022538856ap1981
1990856,900905,27094.7%521301824,708125843360ap1991
19991,038,2751,202,60086.3%931862793,7211058361463ap2000
20001,057,6371,230,25986.0%931842773,8181150062266ap2001
20011,076,0281,253,11885.9%711692404,4831348262568ap2002
20021,077,3081,267,42285.0%781602384,5261744363272ap2003
20031,322,5131,455,71190.8%771602375,5801738765172ap2004
20041,325,8611,455,71191.1%801602405,5241640666172ap2005
20061,390,3001,524,00091.2%912143054,5581756868973ap2007
20131,593,0001,732,00092.0%962203165,0413256170673ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Nov 2014