Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Salinas

Deceased

Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1796Born
16 Apr 182023.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Apr 182023.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Mar 185760.4AppointedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
24 Aug 185760.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
25 Aug 187174.8DiedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Rafael Salinas
Bishop Rafael Salinas (born , died ) Bishop of Cochabamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Plata, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Ordained BishopSucre, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 41
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,623
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast