Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Calixto Orihuela Valderrama, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1767Born
179022.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
29 Mar 181951.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuzco, Peru
29 Mar 181951.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
9 Jul 182052.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
31 Jan 182153.2SelectedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
27 Jun 182153.7ConfirmedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
7 Oct 182153.9InstalledBishop of Cuzco, Peru
25 Aug 183870.8ResignedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
1 Apr 184173.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Calixto Orihuela Valderrama
Bishop José Calixto Orihuela Valderrama O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOropesa

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LB, 30 Jan 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 125, and Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016