Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Diéguez y Florencia

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1775Born
20 May 180428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Peru
14 Aug 183357.6SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
24 Jul 183559.5ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
9 Oct 183660.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
7 Dec 183660.9InstalledBishop of Trujillo, Peru
8 Jun 184569.4DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Tomás Diéguez y Florencia
Bishop Tomás Diéguez y Florencia (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrujillo

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 379
  • sl: LB, 26 Jan 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018