Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Benedicto Torres Romero

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1814Born
19 May 183925.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 186854.0SelectedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
22 Jun 186854.2ConfirmedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
3 Jan 186954.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
8 Jan 188065.7DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Benedicto Torres Romero
Bishop José Benedicto Torres Romero (born , died ) Bishop of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCajabamba, Diocese of Trujillo
Ordained BishopTrujillo, Diocese of Trujillo

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 119
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017