Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Manuel Pasquel y Losada

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1793Born
22 Mar 181724.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
20 Sep 181724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
20 Jan 184854.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
20 Jan 184854.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
7 May 184855.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
14 Jul 185562.3SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
28 Sep 185562.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
16 Dec 185562.7InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
15 Oct 185764.5DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Pasquel y Losada (VIAF: 233123425)
Archbishop José Manuel Pasquel y Losada (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 261, and Page 342
  • ob/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017