Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Solano del Risco, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1829Born
185525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
2 Nov 186435.8SelectedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
27 Mar 186536.2ConfirmedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
29 Jun 186536.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
1900¹70.9ResignedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
27 Apr 190374.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Solano del Risco
Bishop Francesco Solano del Risco O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Anges, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 197
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 123
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017