Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Sebastian Goyeneche y Barreda

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1784BornArequipa
23 May 180723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arequipa, Peru
31 May 180723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arequipa, Peru
14 Apr 181733.2AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
2 Aug 181834.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
10 Nov 181935.8InstalledBishop of Arequipa, Peru
11 Aug 185975.6SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
26 Sep 185975.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
15 Aug 186076.6InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
19 Feb 187288.1DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Sebastian Goyeneche y Barreda:
Archbishop José Sebastian Goyeneche y Barreda (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 53.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 342
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 87
  • c01: LB, 26 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013