Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Ochoa Campos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1814¹Born
1837²23.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arequipa, Peru
1837²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Arequipa, Peru
2 Nov 186450.8SelectedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
27 Mar 186551.2ConfirmedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
15 Oct 186551.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
17 Sep 187561.7ResignedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
18 Oct 188672.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julián Ochoa Campos
Bishop Julián Ochoa Campos (born 1814, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuaroc, Diocese of Cuzco
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: LB, 30 Jan 2013
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018