Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro José Tordoya Montoya

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco

Titular Bishop of Aradus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1813BornCaraveli
18 Jan 183723.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 May 183723.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 186046.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
23 Mar 186046.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
22 Jul 186047.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
17 Sep 187562.2AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
23 Mar 188066.7ResignedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
20 Aug 188067.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
1881¹67.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Tordoya Montoya:
Bishop Pedro José Tordoya Montoya (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1882
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 115, and Page 235
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 553

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013